Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Children | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | File Number 196 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 179 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |