Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Public Act 13-81
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 619
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7171
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 267
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 232
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|