Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Public Act 13-55
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House Calendar Number 557
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6151
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6176
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
File Number 538
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 396
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|