House
|
07/11/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-278
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8938
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 607
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6915
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
File Number 539
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 397
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|