Senate | 05/23/2013 | House Calendar Number 641 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 268 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 233 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |