Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 558 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6052 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 270 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 219 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |