Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 674
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8333
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
File Number 197
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 182
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|