Senate | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |