Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6569
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 652
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
File Number 389
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 270
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|