Senate | 03/19/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Environment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |