Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Public Act 13-231
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House Calendar Number 642
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7609
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 7471
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 441
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 301
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|