Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Public Act 13-248
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
House Calendar Number 659
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 8034
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 654
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 483
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|