Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
House Calendar Number 661
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule D
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8168
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 7745
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Recalled D 7745
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6954
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule D 7745
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule C 6954
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6950
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6952
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
File Number 273
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 224
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|