Senate | 05/22/2013 | House Calendar Number 627 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6107 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | File Number 274 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 225 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |