Senate | 05/14/2013 | File Number 817 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/13/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | File Number 491 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 378 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |