Senate | 05/01/2013 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | File Number 518 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 381 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |