Senate | 06/03/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/28/2013 | Special Act 13-8 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House Calendar Number 560 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | File Number 564 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 413 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |