Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Public Act 13-232
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Calendar Number 686
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8748
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
File Number 655
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 475
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|