Senate | 06/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 687 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | File Number 519 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 380 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |