Senate | 04/15/2013 | File Number 492 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 373 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |