Senate | 05/02/2013 | File Number 681 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 490 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Public Hearing 03/11 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |