Senate
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-283
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
House Calendar Number 668
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8199
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
File Number 541
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 398
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|