Senate | 05/17/2013 | House Calendar Number 611 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | No New File by Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | File Number 390 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 271 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |