Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | File Number 446 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 297 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |