Senate
|
07/12/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Public Act 13-285
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
House Calendar Number 669
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8184
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 5834
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 7911
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7742
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5746
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 447
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 305
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|