Connecticut 2013 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01085 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1085
22 January Session, 2013 LCO No. 4279
33 *04279_______HS_*
44 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
55 Introduced by:
66 (HS)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 1085
1111
1212 January Session, 2013
1313
1414 LCO No. 4279
1515
1616 *04279_______HS_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on HUMAN SERVICES
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (HS)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING A PILOT PROGRAM FOR THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL AND BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES TO YOUTH.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2013) (a) The Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services, in consultation with the Commissioners of Public Health and Social Services, shall establish a pilot program to offer an integrated emotional and behavioral health program for not more than five hundred youth in Hartford and New Haven counties by July 1, 2014.
2929
3030 (b) Not later than October 1, 2013, the Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services shall establish a working group of (1) mental health professionals who serve clients between thirteen and eighteen years of age; (2) mental health clients and other youth between thirteen and eighteen years of age; (3) parents of such youth; and (4) scholars who have studied the needs of this population to study (A) services in place, (B) gaps in service, (C) best practices world-wide, and (D) possible funding sources. Not later than December 31, 2013, the working group shall present the results of its study and an implementation plan for the pilot program to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children, human services and public health.
3131
3232 (c) The pilot program shall include, but not be limited to: (1) Development of application criteria and processes to allow the neediest youth to participate in the pilot program on a first-come, first-served basis; (2) the establishment of teen drop-in centers where such youth can receive counseling and services; (3) a system to track the progress of program participants; and (4) a central repository of information and referral services available at such drop-in centers and on-line regarding emotional and behavioral health.
3333
3434 (d) Not later than July 1, 2015, the Commissioner of Mental Health and Addiction Services shall report, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, on the results of the pilot program to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to children, public health and human services. Such report shall include recommendations to improve and expand the program state-wide.
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4040 Section 1 July 1, 2013 New section
4141
4242 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4343
4444 Section 1
4545
4646 July 1, 2013
4747
4848 New section
4949
5050 Statement of Purpose:
5151
5252 To establish a pilot program offering integrated emotional and behavioral health to youth in Hartford and New Haven counties.
5353
5454 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]