Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Human Services | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | File Number 565 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 403 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |