Senate | 05/23/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | No New File by Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | File Number 391 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 272 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |