Senate | 05/22/2013 | House Calendar Number 628 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | File Number 392 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 273 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/08/2013 | Public Hearing 03/12 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |