Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
Public Act 13-220
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
House Calendar Number 683
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8608
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8619
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8513
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
File Number 319
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 244
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|