Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House Calendar Number 613
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6699
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6703
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6819
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
File Number 424
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 286
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|