Senate | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Public Act 13-21 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | House Calendar Number 494 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | File Number 448 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 311 | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |