Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
House Calendar Number 677
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8378
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
File Number 450
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 298
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|