Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Recommitted to Public Health | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | File Number 584 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 428 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |