House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2013
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Public Act 13-303
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
File Number 879
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7891
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
House Calendar Number 469
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 6377
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6346
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6204
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
File Number 120
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 141
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|