Senate | 05/15/2013 | House Calendar Number 594 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | File Number 684 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 486 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Public Hearing 04/01 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |