Senate | 07/11/2013 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/26/2013 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/19/2013 | Public Act 13-267 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | House Calendar Number 688 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | File Number 612 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Senate Calendar Number 452 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Public Hearing 03/22 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |