Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
Public Act 13-311
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
House Calendar Number 690
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8864
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
File Number 616
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Senate Calendar Number 448
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Public Hearing 03/25
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|