House | 04/14/2014 | File Number 524 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | House Calendar Number 330 | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/24 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/06/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |