House | 04/08/2014 | File Number 436 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | House Calendar Number 250 | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |