House | 04/09/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/07/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | File Number 130 | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | House Calendar Number 79 | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |