House
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5263
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
File Number 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
House Calendar Number 28
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/17/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|