House
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2014
|
Public Act 14-55
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5422
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5419
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
File Number 729
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 537
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 4231
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 4582
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4576
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4248
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
File Number 291
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
House Calendar Number 171
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/20
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|