House | 04/04/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | File Number 40 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | House Calendar Number 37 | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/06/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/04/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/07/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |