Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Public Act 14-71
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Senate Calendar Number 546
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2014
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
File Number 131
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
House Calendar Number 80
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2014
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2014
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2014
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|