Senate | 05/02/2014 | File Number 737 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 547 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2014 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/01/2014 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/01/2014 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4871 | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | File Number 78 | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | House Calendar Number 56 | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/11/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 02/10/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |