Connecticut 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05068 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/07/2014

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 5068
February Session, 2014  LCO No. 499
 *00499_______LAB*
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
Introduced by:
(LAB)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 5068 

February Session, 2014

LCO No. 499

*00499_______LAB*

Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES 

Introduced by:

(LAB)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE COMPENSATION OF STATE BOARD OF MEDIATION AND ARBITRATION ARBITRATORS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 31-98 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2014):

(b) Upon the conclusion of the proceedings, each member of the panel shall receive one hundred seventy-five dollars, and on and after July 1, 2006, two hundred twenty-five dollars and a panel member who prepares a written decision shall receive an additional one hundred twenty-five dollars, and on and after July 1, 2006, one hundred seventy-five dollars, or the single member, if sitting in accordance with section 31-93, shall receive two hundred seventy-five dollars, and on and after July 1, 2006, three hundred twenty-five dollars, provided if the proceedings extend beyond one day, each member shall receive one hundred dollars, [and] on and after July 1, 2006, one hundred fifty dollars, on and after July 1, 2014, two hundred dollars, and on and after July 1, 2015, two hundred twenty-five dollars for each additional day beyond the first day, and provided further no proceeding may be extended beyond two days without the prior approval of the Labor Commissioner for each such additional day.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 October 1, 2014 31-98(b)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

October 1, 2014

31-98(b)

Statement of Purpose: 

To adjust the compensation rate for State Board of Mediation and Arbitration arbitrators so that they are ultimately compensated at a consistent rate for each day they preside over an arbitration proceeding. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]