House | 04/18/2014 | Senate Calendar Number 432 | ||
House | 04/18/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/16/2014 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2014 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | File Number 293 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | House Calendar Number 173 | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2014 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/10/2014 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |