Connecticut 2014 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05078 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/05/2014

                    General Assembly  Committee Bill No. 5078
February Session, 2014  LCO No. 2282
 *02282HB05078ED_*
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
Introduced by:
(ED)

General Assembly

Committee Bill No. 5078 

February Session, 2014

LCO No. 2282

*02282HB05078ED_*

Referred to Committee on EDUCATION 

Introduced by:

(ED)

AN ACT IMPOSING A MORATORIUM ON THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE COMMON CORE STATE STANDARDS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (Effective from passage) For the school year commencing July 1, 2014, the State Board of Education shall (1) implement the academic standards and curriculum guidelines applicable to public schools in the state that had been adopted by the board and in effect on July 6, 2010, and (2) administer the mastery examination, pursuant to section 10-14n of the general statutes, that is not associated with the Common Core State Standards. 

Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) The Department of Education shall conduct a study on the impact of implementing the Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments on school districts in the state. The department, in conducting such study, shall (1) investigate how the state-wide implementation of such standards will affect (A) student learning and student academic achievement, (B) the administration of the mastery examination, pursuant to section 10-14n of the general statutes, and student performance on such examination, (C) state and local costs, including the costs associated with the creation of technology infrastructure necessary for implementing the Common Core State Standards and the Smarter Balanced assessments, and (D) teacher performance evaluations and teacher improvement and remediation plans, (2) analyze, using the items described in subparagraphs (A) to (D), inclusive, of subdivision (1) of this section, the implementation of such standards in those school districts that have commenced implementation of the Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments, (3) analyze and compare the effect on student learning and student academic achievement in states that have begun implementation of the Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments, and (4) consult with each of the following: The Connecticut Association of Boards of Education, the Connecticut Association of Public School Superintendents, the Connecticut Federation of School Administrators, the Connecticut Education Association, the American Federation of Teachers-Connecticut, early childhood education teachers, special education teachers and elementary and high school teachers. Not later than January 1, 2015, the department shall submit such study and a report on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes. 

Sec. 3. (Effective from passage) (a) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 4-85 of the general statutes, the Governor shall not make any quarterly allotment of funds appropriated in section 1 of public act 13-247 to the Department of Education, for Common Core, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, or the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, until the study on the impact of implementing Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments on school districts in the state, as described in section 2 of this act, has been completed and the results of such investigation have been submitted to and reviewed by the General Assembly.

(b) On and after the effective date of this section, the Department of Education shall make no further expenditure of any funds received by said department during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, for purposes of implementing the Common Core State Standards. 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 from passage New section
Sec. 2 from passage New section
Sec. 3 from passage New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

from passage

New section

Sec. 2

from passage

New section

Sec. 3

from passage

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To delay the implementation of the Common Core State Standards in the state. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]

 

Co-Sponsors: REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.

Co-Sponsors: 

REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist. 

H.B. 5078