Connecticut 2014 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05078 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Committee Bill No. 5078
2-February Session, 2014 LCO No. 2282
3- *02282HB05078ED_*
1+General Assembly Proposed Bill No. 5078
2+February Session, 2014 LCO No. 194
43 Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
54 Introduced by:
6-(ED)
5+REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.
76
87 General Assembly
98
10-Committee Bill No. 5078
9+Proposed Bill No. 5078
1110
1211 February Session, 2014
1312
14-LCO No. 2282
15-
16-*02282HB05078ED_*
13+LCO No. 194
1714
1815 Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
1916
2017 Introduced by:
2118
22-(ED)
19+REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.
2320
2421 AN ACT IMPOSING A MORATORIUM ON THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE COMMON CORE STATE STANDARDS.
2522
2623 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2724
28-Section 1. (Effective from passage) For the school year commencing July 1, 2014, the State Board of Education shall (1) implement the academic standards and curriculum guidelines applicable to public schools in the state that had been adopted by the board and in effect on July 6, 2010, and (2) administer the mastery examination, pursuant to section 10-14n of the general statutes, that is not associated with the Common Core State Standards.
29-
30-Sec. 2. (Effective from passage) The Department of Education shall conduct a study on the impact of implementing the Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments on school districts in the state. The department, in conducting such study, shall (1) investigate how the state-wide implementation of such standards will affect (A) student learning and student academic achievement, (B) the administration of the mastery examination, pursuant to section 10-14n of the general statutes, and student performance on such examination, (C) state and local costs, including the costs associated with the creation of technology infrastructure necessary for implementing the Common Core State Standards and the Smarter Balanced assessments, and (D) teacher performance evaluations and teacher improvement and remediation plans, (2) analyze, using the items described in subparagraphs (A) to (D), inclusive, of subdivision (1) of this section, the implementation of such standards in those school districts that have commenced implementation of the Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments, (3) analyze and compare the effect on student learning and student academic achievement in states that have begun implementation of the Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments, and (4) consult with each of the following: The Connecticut Association of Boards of Education, the Connecticut Association of Public School Superintendents, the Connecticut Federation of School Administrators, the Connecticut Education Association, the American Federation of Teachers-Connecticut, early childhood education teachers, special education teachers and elementary and high school teachers. Not later than January 1, 2015, the department shall submit such study and a report on its findings and recommendations to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to education, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes.
31-
32-Sec. 3. (Effective from passage) (a) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 4-85 of the general statutes, the Governor shall not make any quarterly allotment of funds appropriated in section 1 of public act 13-247 to the Department of Education, for Common Core, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, or the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015, until the study on the impact of implementing Common Core State Standards and Smarter Balanced assessments on school districts in the state, as described in section 2 of this act, has been completed and the results of such investigation have been submitted to and reviewed by the General Assembly.
33-
34-(b) On and after the effective date of this section, the Department of Education shall make no further expenditure of any funds received by said department during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, for purposes of implementing the Common Core State Standards.
35-
36-
37-
38-
39-This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
40-Section 1 from passage New section
41-Sec. 2 from passage New section
42-Sec. 3 from passage New section
43-
44-This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
45-
46-Section 1
47-
48-from passage
49-
50-New section
51-
52-Sec. 2
53-
54-from passage
55-
56-New section
57-
58-Sec. 3
59-
60-from passage
61-
62-New section
25+That title 10 of the general statutes be amended to (1) delay the implementation of the Common Core State Standards, (2) require the Department of Education to conduct an investigation on the impact of implementing such standards on school districts in the state, and (3) prevent the department from spending any money appropriated to it from the General Fund to implement such standards until after the results of such investigation have been submitted to and reviewed by the General Assembly.
6326
6427 Statement of Purpose:
6528
6629 To delay the implementation of the Common Core State Standards in the state.
67-
68-[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
69-
70-
71-
72-Co-Sponsors: REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.
73-
74-Co-Sponsors:
75-
76-REP. GIULIANO, 23rd Dist.
77-
78-H.B. 5078